Hernandez-Hernandez v. SPS Specialty Pharmacy Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pedro G. Hernandez-Hernandez
Defendant: SPS Specialty Pharmacy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv01395
Filed: September 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 7703 Discrimination - Review of Agency Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting #7 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead." Defendant shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead not later than November 20, 2024. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/18/2024. (FAR)
October 17, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer To Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint filed by Pedro G. Hernandez-Hernandez filed by Ramon M Gonzalez-Santiago on behalf of SPS Specialty Pharmacy Services, Inc.. Responses due by 10/31/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Gonzalez-Santiago, Ramon)
October 17, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ramon M Gonzalez-Santiago on behalf of SPS Specialty Pharmacy Services, Inc. (Gonzalez-Santiago, Ramon)
October 4, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pedro G. Hernandez-Hernandez upon SPS Specialty Pharmacy Services, Inc. served on 9/30/2024, answer due 10/21/2024. (Attachments: #1 Summons served summons) (Lamela-Gandia, Atabey) Modified on 10/7/2024 to correct event title (mcm).
September 3, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to SPS Specialty Pharmacy Services INC. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vdm)
September 3, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Filing fee received BPRDC-8807242, $ 405.00. (vdm)
September 2, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits initiating documents re: #1 Complaint filed by Pedro G Hernandez Hernandez filed by Atabey Y. Lamela-Gandia on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category sheet, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Exhibit Right to Sue letter)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Lamela-Gandia, Atabey) Modified on 9/3/2024 to correct event title (mcm).
September 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SPS SPECIALTY PHARMACY SERVICES INC, filed by Pedro G Hernandez Hernandez. Service due by 12/2/2024,(Lamela-Gandia, Atabey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez-Hernandez v. SPS Specialty Pharmacy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro G. Hernandez-Hernandez
Represented By: Atabey Y. Lamela-Gandia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPS Specialty Pharmacy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ramon M Gonzalez-Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?