Strong v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Martha S Strong
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 0:2009cv02101
Filed: August 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Chester
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 32 Motion for Attorney Fees per Rule 406b in the net amount of $2,811.50. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 02/23/2012.(bshr, )
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 24 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on March 7, 2011.(cwil, )
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 19 Report and Recommendations; this matter is reversed pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and remanded on the points to the ALJ for further consideration. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on November 22, 2010. (cwil, )
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint - Social Security, filed by Martha S Strong; recommending that the Commissioner's decision be reversed pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and that the case be remanded to the Commissioner for futher administrative action. Objections to R&R due by 11/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on October 18, 2010. (cwil, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strong v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha S Strong
Represented By: W Daniel Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?