USA et al v. American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc et al

Plaintiff: USA, Lynn E Szymoniak, California, State of, Delaware, State of, Florida, State of, Hawaii, State of, Illinois, State of, Indiana, State of, Massachusetts, State of, Minnesota, State of, Montana, State of, Nevada, State of, New Hampshire, State of, New Jersey, State of, New Mexico, State of, New York, State of, North Carolina, State of, Oklahoma, State of, Rhode Island, State of, Virginia, State of, Columbia, District of, Chicago, City of and New York, City of
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc, Saxon Mortgage Services Inc, Lender Processing Services Inc, Docx LLC, CitiMortgage Inc, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Citibank National Association, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, HSBC USA National Association, JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association, US Bank National Association and Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Case Number: 0:2010cv01465
Filed: June 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER OF DISMISSAL dismissing all claims in the action asserted by Relator against U.S. Bank with prejudice as to Relator and without prejudice as to the United States. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 05/28/2015. (bshr, )
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER requesting additional briefing related to the Court's 446 Order and Rule to Show Cause, allowing parties until 02/12/2015 to submit briefs, and suspending all deadlines for motions and responses to currently pending motions until the Court hears arguments on 02/17/2015. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 01/21/2015. (bshr, )
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER finding as moot 421 MOTION to Compel Disclosures, 430 MOTION to Compel Access Pursuant to Relator's Request for Inspection and Copying; granting 420 MOTION to Amend 417 Formal Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 12/08/2014. (bshr, )
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 413 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 412 Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 09/26/2014.(bshr, )
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER denying 404 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54b. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 09/22/2014.(bshr, )
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER re Notices of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF Nos. 362 & 363 ), requesting the USA provide the court with a written response by 05/23/2014 regarding consent to dismissal and reasons for consenting. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 05/21/2014. (bshr, )
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER dismissing, against all Defendants and with prejudice, allegations related to any false claim submitted to the United States, or one of the States, prior to March 23, 2010. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 05/12/2014. (bshr, )
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULE FOR ARGUMENTS ON PENDING MOTIONS re 326 Notice of Hearing on All Pending Motions Scheduled for April 28, 2014. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 04/21/2014. (bshr, )
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER denying 264 Motion to Bifurcate Motions to Dismiss, to Stay Non-Jurisdictional Portions of the Motions, and for Leave to File an Amended and Consolidated Complaint, denying the request to bifurcate the motions to dismiss, denying the request to stay the non-jurisdictional motions, and noting that the Relator is still within her 21-day grace period to amend her complaint once as a matter of course under Rule 15(a)(1)(B). Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 01/22/2014.(bshr, )
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Order to Unseal Case directing the complaints be unsealed and served upon the defendant by the relator and the relators serve this Order and the Notice of The United States That It Is Not Intervening At This Time upon the defendants only after service of the complaint. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 08/02/2013. (bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA et al v. American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Frances C Trapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn E Szymoniak
Represented By: Stuart M Grant
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Represented By: Kenneth M Suggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delaware, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Hampshire, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Jersey, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Mexico, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Carolina, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhode Island, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia, State of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia, District of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago, City of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York, City of
Represented By: Richard A Harpootlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc
Represented By: Melissa J Copeland
Represented By: David R Dugas
Represented By: Dylan T Thriffiley
Represented By: Gerard E Wimberly, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lender Processing Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Docx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC USA National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?