Taylor v. Lang et al
Plaintiff: Dion Orlando Taylor
Defendant: Michael Lang, Eichelberger, Levern Cohen, S Lowery and M E Montouth
Case Number: 0:2010cv02327
Filed: September 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Jasper
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS adopting 52 Report and Recommendations, granting 27 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Levern Cohen, Michael Lang, M E Montouth, Major Eichelberger, S Lowery, denyi ng 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Motion for Protective Order, filed by Dion Orlando Taylor, denying 40 Motion for Declaratory Judgment filed by Dion Orlando Taylor, denying 51 Motion for Declaratory Judgment, Motion for Extension of Time, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Dion Orlando Taylor. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 12/9/2011. (jpet, )
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS adopting 52 Report and Recommendations, granting 27 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Levern Cohen, Michael Lang, Major Eichelberger, S Lowery, M E Montouth, denyi ng 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Motion for Protective Order, filed by Dion Orlando Taylor, denying 40 Motion for Declaratory Judgment filed by Dion Orlando Taylor, denying 51 Motion for Declaratory Judgment, Motion for Extension of Time, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Dion Orlando Taylor. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 11/22/2011. (jpet, ) Modified to edit text on 11/22/2011 (jpet, ).
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 22 Motion to Compel; denying 22 Motion for Sanctions; denying 22 Motion for a "Poor Persons" order Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 8/22/2011.(jpet, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Lang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dion Orlando Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eichelberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levern Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M E Montouth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?