Smith v. US Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: |
Charlotte Ann Smith |
Defendant: |
Bank of America NA, EMC Mortgage Corporation, Guardian Fidelity Mortgage Inc, Howard Wright, Jr, Stacy Youngblood, John Good, Guardian Member-Owners-Shareholders-Stockholders, Bear Stearnes Companies LLC and JPMorgan Chase & Co |
Case Number: |
0:2011cv03251 |
Filed: |
November 30, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of South Carolina |
Office: |
Rock Hill Office |
County: |
York |
Presiding Judge: |
Margaret B Seymour |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal-Contract Dispute |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 15, 2013 |
Filing
70
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 60 Report and Recommendations and dismissing the complaint with prejudice for failure to prosecute pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 1/15/2013. (asni, )
|
July 31, 2012 |
Filing
63
ORDER AND OPINION RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS adopting 60 Report and Recommendations and dismissing the complaint with prejudice for failure to prosecute pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 7/31/2012. (asni, ) (Main Document 63 replaced on 8/1/2012) (asni, ). Modified to replace document to correct case caption on 8/1/2012 (asni, ).
|
June 22, 2012 |
Filing
58
ORDER Plaintiff has failed to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment 40 . As such, it appears to the court that she does not oppose the motion and wishes to abandon this action. Based on the foregoing, Plain tiff is directed to advise the court whether she wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Moving Defendants' motion for summary judgment by July 6, 2012. Plaintiff is further advised that if she fails to respond, this action will be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 6/22/2012. (abuc)
|
February 29, 2012 |
Filing
25
ORDER denying as moot 11 Motion to Stay and denying as moot 17 Motion to Stay. The court grants Plaintiff's request for additional time to find counsel 21 and will allow Plaintiff 30 days within which to notify the court of the identity of an attorney(s) to represent her in this case or, alternatively, of her desire to proceed with this litigation without an attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 2/29/2012.(abuc)
|
February 21, 2012 |
Filing
23
ORDER AND OPINION RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying as moot 5 Motion to Consolidate Cases re 14 Report and Recommendations Judge. Case is recommitted to the Magistrate Judge for additional review and a Report and Recommendation. Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges added.. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 2/20/2012. Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(asni, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?