Wood v. Byars

Petitioner: John R Wood
Respondent: William R Byars, Jr and Wayne C McCabe
Case Number: 0:2012cv03532
Filed: December 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION granting Wood's 151 motion to enlarge the record with respect to Agent Donohue's testimony, denying Wood's 151 motion for an evidentiary hearing and to enlarge the record on Grounds Four, Five, Seven, and Ten, and denying Wood's 151 motion for discovery on Ground Ten. In addition, the court recommends granting Respondents' 136 motion for summary judgment and dismissing Wood's 85 petition. (Objections to R&R due by 10/15/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 10/1/2018. (bgoo)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER LIFTING STAY effective October 2, 2017. Upon lifting of the stay, all pending motions shall be terminated from the docket with leave to refile, if appropriate. Respondents shall file a return to the petition and any di spositive motions on October 3, 2017 and shall supplement the record on that date with a complete record of the state court proceedings that transpired while this case was stayed. Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days to file a response to any dispositive motions filed by Respondents and Respondents shall have twenty-one (21) days from the date of the Petitioner's response to file a reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 8/29/2017. (bgoo)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER continuing the stay of the instant habeas action and directing the parties to inform the court within five (5) days of the conclusion of the PCR action in state court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall continue to submit status reports to the court every ninety (90) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 7/27/2016. (bgoo)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER directing the parties to notify the Court on the status of the PCR action on or before Friday, October 9, 2015. Thereafter, the parties are directed to submit status reports every ninety (90) days advising this Court of the status of the state PCR action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 9/25/2015. (gmil)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 86 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 10/23/2013.(abuc)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 1 Motion for Stay of Execution. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 12/14/2012.(jpet, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John R Wood
Represented By: John H Blume
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Franklin-Best
Represented By: Emily Paavola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William R Byars, Jr
Represented By: Samuel Creighton Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wayne C McCabe
Represented By: Samuel Creighton Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?