Rodriguez v. Bush
Petitioner: Nicanor Perez Rodriguez
Respondent: Dennis Bush
Case Number: 0:2013cv03401
Filed: December 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JUDGMENT (mwal)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER accepting 35 Report and Recommendation. Petitioner is not entitled to relief on his ineffective assistance of counsel or due process claim, and the petition is denied. Petitioner is advised that he may seek a certificate from the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals under Rule 22 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 4/20/2015. (mwal)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 21 Report and Recommendation, and 8 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Dennis Bush. The court hereby ORDERS that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED. Accordingly, the Respondent's motion for summary judgment is hereby GRANTED and the Petition is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L. Wooten on 7/30/2014. (gmil)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nicanor Perez Rodriguez
Represented By: Matthew J Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dennis Bush
Represented By: Donald John Zelenka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?