Massey v. Branham et al
Plaintiff: John K Massey, Jr
Defendant: J T Branham and County of York
Case Number: 0:2014cv01876
Filed: May 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER adopting 134 Report and Recommendation; granting Defendants' 120 Motion for Summary Judgment; and dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 2/27/2017. (mwal)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying 83 MOTION to Amend/Correct; denying 84 MOTION to Compel; and denying 89 MOTION for Physical and Mental Examinations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 8/26/2015. (mwal)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER accepting 36 Report and Recommendation, granting 45 Motion to Amend/Correct, denying 9 Motion to Remand, and granting 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges added. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 3/23/2015. Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(mwal)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 33 Motion to Produce; denying 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 10 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; denying 12 Motion for Discovery; denying 17 Motion to Produce; denying 22 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; denying 22 Motion to Produce. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 10/27/2014.(abuc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massey v. Branham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John K Massey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J T Branham
Represented By: Robert David Garfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of York
Represented By: Robert David Garfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?