Hubbard v. Spartanburg County Detention Facility et al
Plaintiff: Robert Bruce Trey Hubbard
Defendant: Spartanburg County Detention Facility, LT. M. Jones, Deputy T. Hadden, SGT W. Church, Maj. Neal Urch, SGT K. Ashley, Capt. Hollifield, SGT L. Pilgrim, Cpl. M. Higgins and Chaplain Ken Apple
Case Number: 0:2014cv02910
Filed: July 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Spartanburg
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 JUDGMENT dismissing this action with prejudice. (gmil)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER - The Plaintiff shall advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to the defendant's motion to dismiss 67 within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. Plaintiff is further advised that if he fails to respond, this action may be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 6/17/2015. (gmil)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING 48 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, ordering that the defendants Spartanburg County Detention Facility, LT. M. Jones, Maj. Neal Urch, and Capt. Hollifield are dismissed from this case without prejudice a nd without issuance and service of process. It is further ordered that 20 Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is terminated as moot. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 4/15/2015. (gmil) Modified to edit docket text on 4/15/2015 (gmil).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubbard v. Spartanburg County Detention Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bruce Trey Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartanburg County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy T. Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT W. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maj. Neal Urch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT K. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Hollifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT L. Pilgrim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl. M. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Ken Apple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?