Sitz v. Thomas
Respondent: Gregory Lynn Sitz and L R Thomas
Case Number: 0:2015cv03083
Filed: August 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Jasper
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER concurring in the 16 recommendation of the Magistrate Judge and dismissing the action without prejudice and without requiring Respondent to file a return. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's 21 motion for release is denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Margaret B. Seymour on 7/28/2016. (bgoo)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER directing the Petitioner to inform the court no later than July 15, 2016, whether he has sought from the Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit authorization to file a successive habeas application pursuant to Johnson, and whether he has filed for relief under § 2255 in the sentencing court. Signed by Honorable Margaret B. Seymour on 7/1/2016. (bgoo)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER directing Clerk of Court to assign separate civil action numbers to Plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 8/5/2015. (gmil)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sitz v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gregory Lynn Sitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L R Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?