Owens v. Stirling et al

Petitioner: Freddie Owens
Respondent: Bryan P Stirling and Joseph McFadden
Case Number: 0:2016cv02512
Filed: July 12, 2016
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Abbeville
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2018 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 196 Motion for Extension of Time to file Objections to the Report and Recommendation. (Respondent's objections to R&R due by 2/16/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Chief Judge Terry L. Wooten on 1/26/2018. (bgoo)
January 24, 2018 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 194 First Motion for Extension of Time to file Objections to Report and Recommendation. (Objections to R&R due by 2/16/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Chief Judge Terry L. Wooten on 1/24/2018. (bgoo)
July 20, 2017 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling Petitioner's 157 Objections. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 7/20/2017. (bgoo)
May 8, 2017 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Petitioner's 92 Second and Renewed Motion and Request for Authority to Conduct Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 5/8/2017. (bgoo)
April 27, 2017 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 4/27/2017. (bgoo)
October 18, 2016 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's 93 Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall notify the court within five (5) days of the disposition of Petitioner's currently pending PCR application in state court, and the parties shall submit status reports to the court every sixty (60) days advising this court of the status of the state PCR action. The parties are hereby notified that the court may lift the stay should the court determine that resuming Petitioner's federal habeas action is the best course for the efficient and expedient resolution of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 10/18/2016. (bgoo)
August 17, 2016 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Petitioner's 103 Motion for Extension of Time and directing Petitioner to file his Reply to the Response in Opposition to the 92 Motion for Authority to Conduct Discovery and Reply to the Responses in Opposition to the 93 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Exhaustion of State Remedies on or before September 1, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 8/17/2016. (bgoo)
August 10, 2016 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that Petitioner should be granted a stay of execution. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this stay shall be extended pending resolution of Petitioner's habeas petition. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L. Wooten on 8/10/2016. (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Stirling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Freddie Owens
Represented By: John Dennis Delgado
Represented By: William Harry Ehlies, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan P Stirling
Represented By: James Anthony Mabry
Represented By: Donald John Zelenka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph McFadden
Represented By: James Anthony Mabry
Represented By: Donald John Zelenka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?