Heggins v. US Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dregory C. Heggins
Defendant: US Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2016cv02786
Filed: August 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. (mwal)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER directed to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Defendants 29 MOTION to Dismiss by May 22, 2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 5/8/2017. (mwal)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Chan Mo Ahn and David Bradley Jordan terminated. If Plaintiff does not wish to continue with this lawsuit, he may request that the court dismiss the case in its entirety. To this end, Plaintiff shall, by January 24, 2017, complete the attached notice and mail it to the Clerk of Court at the address indicated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 12/27/2016. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heggins v. US Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dregory C. Heggins
Represented By: Chan Mo Ahn
Represented By: David Bradley Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Mark V Gende
Represented By: William O Sweeny, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?