Browning v. Mansukhani
Petitioner: Thomas W Browning
Respondent: A Mansukhani
Case Number: 0:2016cv03237
Filed: September 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Hampton
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER AND OPINION denying Petitioner's 40 motion to vacate. Signed by Honorable Richard M. Gergel on 12/7/2017. (bgoo)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER AND OPINION adopting the 34 Report and Recommendation and granting the Respondent's 13 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Honorable Richard M. Gergel on 5/3/2017. (bgoo)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER declining to adopt the 21 Report and Recommendation and recommitting the matter to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Richard M. Gergel on 3/9/2017. (bgoo)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing the petitioner to advise the court as to whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to the respondent's 13 motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment withi n fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. The petitioner is further advised that if he fails to respond, this action will be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. (Response to Motion due by 2/9/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 1/26/2017. (bgoo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Browning v. Mansukhani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas W Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A Mansukhani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?