Griffin v. Cellman et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Griffin
Defendant: Correctional Officer Cellman, Correctional Officer Edgarton, Correctional Officer Bordem and Correctional Officer Blakely
Case Number: 0:2017cv00152
Filed: January 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER adopting the 74 Report and Recommendation and granting the Defendants' 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/22/2018. (bgoo)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 40 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Terrance Griffin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 8/8/2017. (mwal)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER directing each legal representative entering an appearance in this matter on behalf of any defendant to complete a Defendant's Certification and file it with the court within seven (7) days from the date of this ord er. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if any party disagrees with the court's construction of the Plaintiff's claims, he or she may file an appropriate motion with the court within seven (7) days from the date of this order. (Defendant's Certification due by 5/30/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 5/22/2017. (bgoo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Cellman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Cellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Edgarton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Bordem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Blakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?