Fletcher v. Trusdale
Plaintiff: Henry Fletcher
Defendant: Jackie Trusdale
Case Number: 0:2017cv01604
Filed: June 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION AND ORDER adopting the 75 Report and Recommendation, granting in part the Defendant's 65 motion for summary judgment, denying the portions of Defendant's 65 motion that are inconsistent with this order and dismissing such claims without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Margaret B. Seymour on 1/7/2019. (bgoo)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 OPINION AND ORDER concurring in the 47 Report and Recommendation and denying Plaintiff's 38 motion for a temporary restraining order. Signed by Honorable Margaret B. Seymour on 1/11/2018. (bgoo)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying without prejudice the plaintiff's 26 37 motions for the issuance of subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/6/2017. (bgoo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fletcher v. Trusdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Trusdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?