Pennington v. Fluor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Harry Pennington , III
Defendant: Fluor Corporation, Fluor Enterprises Inc and SCANA Corporation
Case Number: 0:2017cv02094
Filed: August 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:2101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER AND OPINION granting(233) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying(235) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting(236) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 0:17-cv-02094-JMC; granting(189) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying(19 1) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting(192) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 0:17-cv-02201-JMC ; denying 219 Plaintiff's Request to Supplement and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/1/2021.Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-02094-JMC, 0:17-cv-02201-JMC(asni, )
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting (272) Motion to Stay in case 0:17-cv-02094-JMC; granting (229) Motion to Stay in case 0:17-cv-02201-JMC. The court will not stay the trial deadline absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 12/15/2020.Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-02201-JMC, 0:17-cv-02094-JMC(asni, )
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting (203) Motion to Approve Mediator in case 0:17-cv-02094-JMC; granting (157) Motion to approve mediator in case 0:17-cv-02201-JMC Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/27/2020.Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-02094-JMC, 0:17-cv-02201-JMC(asni, )
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting (178) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:17-cv-02094-JMC; granting (131) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:17-cv-02201-JMC; granting (25) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:19-cv-00346-JMC Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/5/2019.Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00346-JMC, 0:17-cv-02094-JMC, 0:17-cv-02201-JMC(asni, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER AND OPINION: The court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court for the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina to REMOVE Eigner and Johnson as named Plaintiffs in this action. Lastly, the court ORDERS Fluor D efendants and Butler Plaintiffs to provide briefing regarding the issue of attorney's fees under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Fluor Defendants' brief is due by June 28, 2019, while Butler Plaintiffs' response is due by July 5, 2019. Fluor Defendants may reply to Butler Plaintiffs' response by July 10, 2019, if they so choose. granting 161 Motion to Remove Named Plaintiffs Darron Eigner, Jr. and Bernard A. Johnson in case 0:17-cv-02094-JMC; granting [109 ] Motion Fluor Defendants Motions to Remove Named Plaintiffs Darron Eigner, Jr. and Bernard A. Johnson in case 0:17-cv-02201-JMC. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/21/2019.Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-02094-JMC, 0:17-cv-02201-JMC(asni, )
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 143 Motion Plaintiffs' Motion for a Supplemental Order Approving the Sending of Notice of Class Certification and Related Relief (ECF Nos. 89, 143), Attaching the Approved No tice to the Court's Order and Opinion, and Ordering Fluor Defendants, SCANA Defendants, and Pennington Plaintiffs to Comply with a List of Mandates Set Forth Within the Conclusion of the Court's Order and Opinion in case 0:17-cv-02094-JMC; granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion Plaintiffs' Motion for a Supplemental Order Approving the Sending of Notice of Class Certification and Related Relief (ECF Nos. 89, 143), Attaching the Approved Notice to the Court's Order and Opinion, and Ordering Fluor Defendants, SCANA Defendants, and Pennington Plaintiffs to Comply with a List of Mandates Set Forth Within the Conclusion of the Court's Order and Opinion in case 0:17-cv-02201-JMC Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/20/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Class Notice)Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-02094-JMC, 0:17-cv-02201-JMC(asni, )
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DENYING IN PART MOTION to Compel (141 in 0:17-cv-02094-JMC, 87 in 0:17-cv-02201-JMC) Specifically, the court GRANTS Defendants' Motions to the extent that (1) Eigner and Johnson must respond to discovery requests, but DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE (1) Fluor Defendants' request to dismiss Eigner and Johnson from the action, and (2) Fluor Defendants' request for an award of attorney's fees and costs relating to the Motions to Compel (ECF Nos. 87, 141). Therefore, the court ORDERS Eigner and Johnson to adequately respond to Fluor Defendants' discovery requests by May 10, 2019, at 5:00 p.m., and ORDERS the removal of Eigner and Johnson as named Plaintiffs in this action if they do not respond by May 10, 2019, at 5:00 p.m. ( Specific Document due by 5/10/2019). Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/3/2019. Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-02094-JMC, 0:17-cv-02201-JMC(asni, )
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting (137) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 0:17-cv-02094-JMC; granting (83) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 0:17-cv-02201-JMC. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/23/2018.Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-02094-JMC, 0:17-cv-02201-JMC(asni, )
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER AND OPINION granting 21 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/17/2018.(asni, )
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER AND OPINION denying 110 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/13/2018.(asni, )
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/13/2017.(asni, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennington v. Fluor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Pennington , III
Represented By: Lucy Clark Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCANA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?