Griffin v. Masico et al
Plaintiff: Donald E. Griffin, Jr.
Defendant: Alice Masico and Aaron Joyner
Case Number: 0:2017cv02852
Filed: October 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER adopting the 82 Report and Recommendation and granting the Defendants' 57 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. on 2/14/2019. (bgoo)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 61 motion for leave to file an amended complaint, 69 motion for an extension of time to file an amended complaint, and 67 motion to appoint counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 10/1/2018. (bgoo)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER directing the parties to inform the court in writing of the status of this case on or before March 15, 2018 and advise the court whether the case is ready for trial. (Status Report due by 3/15/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 3/8/2018. (bgoo)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER directing each legal representative entering an appearance in this matter on behalf of any defendant to complete a Defendant's Certification and file it with the court within seven (7) days from the date of this ord er. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if any party disagrees with the court's construction of the Plaintiff's claims, he or she may file an appropriate motion with the court within seven (7) days from the date of this order. (Defendant's Certification due by 12/15/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/8/2017. (bgoo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Masico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E. Griffin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Masico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?