Johnson v. Lagtta et al
Plaintiff: |
Frank Stephon Johnson |
Defendant: |
Lt. Lagtta, Lt. Lippett, Lt. Sligh, Director Myers, Capt. Higgins, Capt. Moye, Capt. Bufford, Lt. Hayes, Lt. William, Lt. Seward and Lt. Mccoullgh |
Case Number: |
0:2018cv00996 |
Filed: |
April 12, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of South Carolina |
Office: |
Rock Hill Office |
County: |
Richland |
Presiding Judge: |
Henry M Herlong |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 24, 2019 |
Filing
63
OPINION & ORDER adopting and incorporating the 58 Report and Recommendation, dismissing Officer Roach, denying Johnson's 61 motion to amend, and denying Johnson's 62 motion to appoint counsel. Signed by Honorable Henry M. Herlong, Jr. on 1/24/2019. (bgoo) Modified on 1/24/2019 to edit text. (bgoo)
|
December 28, 2018 |
Filing
58
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 49 motion to amend and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Defendant Roach be dismissed. (Objections to R&R due by 1/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/28/2018. (bgoo)
|
October 29, 2018 |
Filing
45
ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, denying Plaintiff's 40 motion to amend and recommending that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Roach be dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 10/29/2018. (bgoo)
|
July 19, 2018 |
Filing
26
OPINION AND ORDER construing Johnson's 25 objections as a motion to amend the complaint and granting such motion. Johnson is granted twenty (20) days from the entry of this order to amend his complaint. It is further ordered that the case is remanded to Magistrate Judge Gossett for further proceedings. (Amended Complaint due by 8/8/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Honorable Henry M. Herlong, Jr. on 7/19/2018. (bgoo)
|
May 14, 2018 |
Filing
12
OPINION & ORDER dismissing Johnson's claims against Lt. Lagtta, Lt. Lippett, Lt. Sligh, Director Myers, Capt. Higgins, Capt. Moye, Capt. Bufford, Lt. Hayes, Lt. William, Lt. Seward, and Lt. Mccoullgh with prejudice. It is further ordered that Johnson's 10 motion to amend the complaint is granted in part and denied in part. Johnson is granted twenty (20) days from the entry of this order to amend his complaint to add Officer Roach as a party. It is further ordered that the case is remanded to Magistrate Judge Gossett for further proceedings. (Amended Complaint due by 6/4/2018.) Signed by Honorable Henry M. Herlong, Jr. on 5/14/2018. (bgoo)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?