Slagsvol et al v. Thomas Oswald General Carpentry and Builders, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Slagsvol and M. Whitner Slagsvol
Defendant: Thomas A. Oswald and Thomas Oswald General Carpentry and Builders, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Thomas Oswald General Carpentry & Builders, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Richard Molten
Case Number: 0:2018cv03144
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #29 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Richard Molten.(Burton, Stephanie)
January 9, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint by Thomas Oswald General Carpentry and Builders, LLC and Thomas A. Oswald; THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Richard Molten by Thomas Oswald General Carpentry & Builders, LLC; COUNTERCLAIM against Elizabeth Slagsvol, M. Whitner Slagsvol by Thomas Oswald General Carpentry and Builders, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Mechanic's Lien)(Goodwyn, Thomas) Modified to edit text on 1/9/2019 (cbru, ).
January 8, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to Counterclaim #10 by Elizabeth Slagsvol, M. Whitner Slagsvol.(Powell, Warren)
January 7, 2019 Filing 27 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Richard Molten.(Burton, Stephanie)
January 7, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #10 Third Party Complaint by Richard Molten.(Burton, Stephanie) Modified to link correct event to associated event on 1/8/2019 (cbru, ).
January 3, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Thomas A. Oswald, Thomas Oswald General Carpentry and Builders, LLC filed by Elizabeth Slagsvol, M. Whitner Slagsvol. Service due by 4/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - AIA Document A-103 - 2007) (Powell, Warren) Modified to edit text and to add description to attachment on 1/3/2019 (cbru, ).
December 21, 2018 Filing 22 Second Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thomas A. Oswald, Thomas Oswald General Carpentry & Builders, LLC.(Goodwyn, Thomas)
December 20, 2018 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' amended response to Local Civil Rule Interrogatory 26.01(C) filed as ECF No. #16 remains incomplete. This party is directed to file a complete response to all subparts of inquiry (C) within three business days of entry of this order. Failure to comply with this order will result in the imposition of sanctions, which may, without further notice, include exclusion of some or all defenses or a monetary sanction not to exceed $500. (Supplement due by 12/28/2018) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 12/20/2018. (cbru, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 20 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 18. Reason: Attachments within main document. Corrected Filing Document Number #19 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A. (cbru, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas A. Oswald, Thomas Oswald General Carpentry & Builders, LLC. Richard Molten served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Goodwyn, Thomas) Modified to edit text on 12/19/2018 (cbru, ).
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 1/22/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/14/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/11/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/9/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/9/2019, Discovery due by 7/5/2019, Motion in Limine due by 11/8/2019, Motions due by 7/18/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/26/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 12/2/2019, ADR Statement due by 8/15/2019, Mediation Due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 12/18/2018. (cbru, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY by Thomas A. Oswald, Elizabeth Slagsvol, M. Whitner Slagsvol, Thomas Oswald General Carpentry & Builders, LLC to 14 Order. Filing corrected for event type (cbru, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 16 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thomas A. Oswald, Thomas Oswald General Carpentry & Builders, LLC.(Goodwyn, Thomas) Modified to edit text on 12/18/2018 (cbru, ).
December 13, 2018 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: In Plaintiffs' Complaint, they state Defendants either live or have their principal place of business in Fairfield County. However, the Complaint also states "both defendants reside in the Columbia District and a substantial part of the events took place in the Columbia District". Fairfield County is in the Rock Hill Division of the District of South Carolina; therefore, the case was filed as a Rock Hill Division case. However, in Defendants' answer to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, they state Defendants admit to the facts in paragraph 5 of the Complaint and note "Plaintiff contends that the proper division is the Columbia Division". Due to the confusion as to the proper Division in which this case should be filed, the parties are hereby directed to confer and attempt to reach agreement regarding the proper Division. No later than December 20, 2019, the parties shall respond to this Text Order and notify the court in which Division this case should be filed. If the parties disagree, each party shall submit its argument by the same date. (Reply due by 12/20/2018) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 12/13/2018. (cbru, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' response to Local Civil Rule Interrogatory 26.01(C) filed as ECF No. #11 is incomplete. These parties are directed to file a complete response to all subparts of the inquiry within three business days of entry of this order. (Supplement due by 12/18/2018) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 12/13/2018. (cbru, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 LIS PENDENS by Thomas Oswald General Carpentry & Builders, LLC. (Goodwyn, Thomas) Modified to remove filer not listed on document on 12/13/2018 (cbru, ).
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thomas A. Oswald, Thomas Oswald General Carpentry & Builders, LLC.(Goodwyn, Thomas) Modified to edit text on 12/13/2018 (cbru, ).
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Thomas A. Oswald, Thomas Oswald General Carpentry & Builders, LLC; THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Richard Molten by Thomas Oswald General Carpentry & Builders, LLC; COUNTERCLAIM against Elizabeth Slagsvol, M. Whitner Slagsvol by Thomas Oswald General Carpentry & Builders, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mechanic's Lien, #2 Certificate of Service)(Goodwyn, Thomas) Modified to edit text on 12/13/2018 (cbru, ).
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M. Whitner Slagsvol, Elizabeth Slagsvol. Thomas A. Oswald served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (Powell, Warren) (Main Document 9 replaced on 11/30/2018) (cbru, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2018: #1 Affidavit of Service) (cbru, ).
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M. Whitner Slagsvol, Elizabeth Slagsvol. Thomas Oswald General Carpentry & Builders, LLC served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (Powell, Warren) (Main Document 8 replaced on 11/30/2018) (cbru, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2018: #1 Affidavit of Service) (cbru, ).
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Elizabeth Slagsvol, M. Whitner Slagsvol.(Powell, Warren)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' response to Local Civil Rule Interrogatory 26.01(B) filed as ECF No. #3 is incomplete. These parties are directed to respond as to whether or not they have a jury demand within three business days of entry of this order. (Supplement due by 11/29/2018) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 11/26/2018. (cbru, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Thomas A. Oswald. (cbru, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Thomas Oswald General Carpentry & Builders, LLC. (cbru, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Elizabeth Slagsvol, M. Whitner Slagsvol.(cbru, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas A. Oswald, Thomas Oswald General Carpentry & Builders, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8119373) filed by M. Whitner Slagsvol, Elizabeth Slagsvol. Service due by 2/19/2019(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slagsvol et al v. Thomas Oswald General Carpentry and Builders, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. Oswald
Represented By: Thomas Jefferson Goodwyn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Oswald General Carpentry and Builders, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Jefferson Goodwyn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Thomas Oswald General Carpentry & Builders, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Jefferson Goodwyn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Slagsvol
Represented By: Warren C Powell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Whitner Slagsvol
Represented By: Warren C Powell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Richard Molten
Represented By: Stephanie H Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?