Lampkin et al v. United States of America, The
Plaintiff: Gregory Lampkin, Jr and Dong Lym Lampkin
Defendant: United States of America, The
Case Number: 0:2019cv01410
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dong Lym Lampkin, Gregory Lampkin, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt AUSA Main Street)(asni, ) refiled by the clerk to correct event type.
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dong Lym Lampkin, Gregory Lampkin, Jr. United States of America, The served on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt USA) refiled by the clerk to correct event type. (asni, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christie V Newman on behalf of United States of America, The (Newman, Christie)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Dong Lym Lampkin, Gregory Lampkin, Jr.(asni, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America, The. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (asni, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, The ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8443181.), filed by Dong Lym Lampkin, Gregory Lampkin, Jr. Service due by 8/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Expert Affidavit of Edith Gurewitsch Allen, MD, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit (CV), #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit (Expert Report))(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lampkin et al v. United States of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lampkin, Jr
Represented By: Steven Randall Hood
Represented By: Chance Michael Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dong Lym Lampkin
Represented By: Steven Randall Hood
Represented By: Chance Michael Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, The
Represented By: Christie V Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?