Horne v. Lancaster County Sheriff's Office

Plaintiff: Deborah Horne
Defendant: Lancaster County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 0:2019cv01470
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 22 Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Lancaster County Sheriff's Office.(dsto, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Lancaster County Sheriff's Office.(Johnson, Christopher)
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Lancaster County Sheriff's Office. (Johnson, Christopher) Modified on 7/15/2019 to remove attachment and file separately as #22 .(dsto)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Lancaster County Sheriff's Office. (Johnson, Christopher)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER Entry #14 Reason: to correct event code. Corrected Filing Document Number #16 (dsto, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 Withdrawal of Motions: #9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Lancaster County Sheriff's Office. (Johnson, Christopher) Modified to correct event code. (dsto, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Lancaster County Sheriff's Office.(Johnson, Christopher)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Response filed by Deborah Horne.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/8/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Bowen, Elizabeth)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF #11 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Deborah Horne. Lancaster County Sheriff's Office served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bowen, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/26/2019 to link correct event to associated event. (dsto)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lancaster County Sheriff's Office, filed by Deborah Horne. Service due by 9/18/2019 (Bowen, Elizabeth)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/10/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/24/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/24/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/16/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/13/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/13/2019, Discovery due by 1/8/2020, Motions due by 1/22/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/1/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/1/2020, ADR Statement due by 2/20/2020, Mediation Due by 3/18/2020.Motions in limine must be filed by May 11, 2020.Parties shall file pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 06/19/2019. (dsto, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Lancaster County Sheriff's Office. Response to Motion due by 6/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Johnson, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lancaster County Sheriff's Office.(Johnson, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lancaster County Sheriff's Office.(Johnson, Christopher)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Deborah Horne. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bowen, Elizabeth)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lancaster County Sheriff's Office. Service due by 8/19/2019. (dsto, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Deborah Horne.(dsto, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lancaster County Sheriff's Office (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8454971), filed by Deborah Horne. Service due by 8/19/2019.(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horne v. Lancaster County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Christopher W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Horne
Represented By: James Lewis Cromer
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?