Goodwin v. Mackelburg
Petitioner: Eddie Kodell Goodwin
Respondent: Warden Mackelburg
Case Number: 0:2019cv01816
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number SCX300082814 (bgoo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #4 Proper Form Order and IFP application placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Eddie Kodell Goodwin, 17219-021, FCI Estill, PO Box 699, Estill, SC 29918 (bgoo)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 7/31/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 7/10/2019. (bgoo)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Eddie Kodell Goodwin. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. Mackelburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Mackelburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eddie Kodell Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?