Broome v. City of Tega Cay
Plaintiff: Richard Alex Broome
Defendant: City of Tega Cay
Case Number: 0:2019cv02036
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Richard Alex Broome.(Babb, Julius)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by City of Tega Cay.(Aydlette, D L)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by City of Tega Cay.(Aydlette, D L)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by City of Tega Cay.(Aydlette, D L)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER (Rule 26 Report due by 8/29/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/24/2019, Discovery due by 2/21/2020, Motions due by 3/9/2020, Mediation Due by 5/6/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 7/26/2019. (bgoo)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by City of Tega Cay. (Aydlette, D L)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Richard Alex Broome.(Babb, Julius)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by City of Tega Cay. (bgoo)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-46-02105, filed by City of Tega Cay. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8567460) (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broome v. City of Tega Cay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Alex Broome
Represented By: Julius Wistar Babb, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tega Cay
Represented By: D L Dirk Aydlette, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?