Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Robert G. Edwards and Kickstand Sports Bar and Grill LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv02070
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0553
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. (Robert G. Edwards answer due 9/25/2019, Kickstand Sports Bar and Grill LLC answer due 9/25/2019) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/16/2019.(cbru, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Robert G. Edwards, Kickstand Sports Bar and Grill LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Field, James) Modified to link correct event to associated event and to edit text on 8/30/2019 (cbru, ).
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 11. Reason: Multiple deficiencies. Corrected Filing Document Number #13 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: 8/26/2019. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A. (cbru, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 10. Reason: Duplicate of entry number #9 . (cbru, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Kickstand Sports Bar and Grill LLC served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Filing corrected for event type and filing date (cbru, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Robert G. Edwards, Kickstand Sports Bar and Grill LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Field, James) Modified on 8/22/2019 to correct motion relief (mdea, ). Modified to link correct event to associated event, to add filer listed on document, and to edit text on 8/27/2019 (cbru, ). (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/30/2019) (cbru, ).
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office, Library of Congress, Washington, D.C. 20559 (cbru, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (cbru, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Report on the filing of an Action regarding a copyright . (Alford, Gregory)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kickstand Sports Bar and Grill LLC. (cbru, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Robert G. Edwards. (cbru, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(cbru, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert G. Edwards, Kickstand Sports Bar and Grill LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8573740) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Service due by 10/21/2019(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G. Edwards
Represented By: James Elliott Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kickstand Sports Bar and Grill LLC
Represented By: James Elliott Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Milam Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?