Pittman v. Thompson et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Pittman
Defendant: Does 1-5 and Daniel W Thompson
Case Number: 0:2019cv02095
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 10 Reason: 26(a)(1) initial disclosures are no longer filed with the court only exchanged between the parties. (asni, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 First Rule 26(f) Report by Daniel W Thompson.(Jones, Alan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ronald Pittman.(Burgess, Jason)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for York County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal filed 7/26/19)(Jones, Alan)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 1/22/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/29/2019. (asni, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/19/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/3/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 9/3/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/15/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/14/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/16/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/16/2019, Discovery due by 1/15/2020, Motion in Limine due by 3/6/2020, Motions due by 1/29/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/6/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 4/7/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/29/2019. (asni, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Daniel W Thompson.(asni, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Daniel W Thompson. (asni, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County, case number 2019-CP-40-01281. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8580373), filed by Daniel W Thompson. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pittman v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel W Thompson
Represented By: Alan Grant Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Pittman
Represented By: Jason William Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?