York Technical College v. Joint Review Committee on Education in Radiology Technology
Plaintiff: York Technical College
Defendant: Joint Review Committee on Education in Radiology Technology
Case Number: 0:2020cv00775
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. The Court will conduct a Rule 16 Telephone Conference on 5/6/2020 02:00 PM before the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon. Plaintiffs counsel is to initiate the call and have all parties on the line before calling the Court at (843) 292-5650. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 3/20/2020. (lgib, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/9/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 5/6/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/3/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/29/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/28/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/17/2020, Discovery due by 9/16/2020, Motion in Limine due by 11/16/2020, Motions due by 9/30/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/24/2020, Bench Trial Deadline 12/15/2020, Mediation Due by 10/14/2020. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 3/20/2020. (lgib, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joint Review Committee on Education in Radiology Technology.(Shuler, Franklin)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Joint Review Committee on Education in Radiology Technology.(Shuler, Franklin)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by York Technical College. Joint Review Committee on Education in Radiology Technology served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Davis, Kenneth)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Joint Review Committee on Education in Radiology Technology. Service due by 5/20/2020. (hcic, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by York Technical College.(hcic, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joint Review Committee on Education in Radiology Technology (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8956261), filed by York Technical College. (hcic, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: York Technical College v. Joint Review Committee on Education in Radiology Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joint Review Committee on Education in Radiology Technology
Represented By: Franklin Grady Shuler, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: York Technical College
Represented By: Tierney F Dukes
Represented By: Kenneth Allen Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?