Lloyd III v. Hutchinston
Petitioner: James M. Lloyd III
Respondent: J. Hutchinston
Case Number: 0:2020cv00963
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT by James M. Lloyd III to #8 Objection to Report and Recommendation. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope) (mmcd)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendation by James M. Lloyd III. Reply to Objections due by 4/20/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter 1, #2 Cover Letter 2, #3 Envelope) (mmcd) Supplement filed on 4/29/2020 at #12 (mmcd).
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #4 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, served on US Attorney General on 3/31/2020. (mmcd)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #4 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to James M. Lloyd III 96603-071 F.C.I. P.O. Box 725 Edgefield, SC 29824 and and #4 Order and copy of petition sent via certified mail to the US Attorney General (article no.7017 1450 0001 4670 9710). (mmcd)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the #1 petition be dismissed without prejudice and without requiring the respondent to file a return. Objections to R&R due by 4/8/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 3/25/2020. (mmcd)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 3/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Habeas Petition) (mmcd)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00 Receipt number SCX300086423.) Filed by James M. Lloyd III. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Supporting Documents Requirements for Meeting 2241 & 2255 Saving Clause Petitioner Meets the Wheeler Prongs, #3 Supporting Documents Additional Grounds for Relief, #4 Supporting Documents, #5 Cover Letter, #6 Envelope) (mmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd III v. Hutchinston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. Hutchinston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James M. Lloyd III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?