Byers v. Walmart Inc
Plaintiff: Loretta Byers
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Case Number: 0:2020cv02669
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. The Court will conduct a Rule 16 Telephone Conference on 10/21/2020 10:45 AM before the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon. Plaintiffs counsel is to initiate the call and have all parties on the line before calling the Court at (843) 292-5650. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 09/02/2020. (lgib, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/22/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 10/19/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/16/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/11/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/11/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/1/2021, Discovery due by 3/1/2021, Motion in Limine due by 4/30/2021, Motions due by 3/15/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/11/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 6/1/2021, Mediation Due by 3/29/2021. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 09/02/2020. (lgib, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Loretta Byers.(O'Brien, Carrie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service - Answer) (lgib, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Strike by Walmart Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Strike, #2 Certificate of Service - Motion to Strike, #3 Certificate of Service - Memorandum) No proposed order. (lgib, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Walmart Inc. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service - Rule 26.01 Responses) (lgib, ).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-46-01868 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9225132), filed by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service - Notice of Removal) (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byers v. Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Rebecca Laffitte
Represented By: John M Montgomery
Represented By: Rachel M Hutchens
Represented By: Vordman Carlisle Traywick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Byers
Represented By: Carrie H O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?