Lett v. Hawkins et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lett and Jeffrey A Lett
Defendant: Kelley B Hawkins, Rolf M Baghdady, Family Trust Federal Credit Union, Kelley M Hawkins and Kelly M Hawkins
Case Number: 0:2020cv03220
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and MOTION to Strike by Jeffrey Lett. Response to Motion due by 11/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Cook v. Phillips)No proposed order.(Radeker, Andrew).
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Jeffrey Lett. (Lybrand, Erica)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Rolf M Baghdady, Kelley B Hawkins.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/20/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Baghdady, Rolf)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 4/7/2021, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/13/2020. (asni, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/2/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/16/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 11/16/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/29/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/28/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/1/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/1/2021, Discovery due by 3/31/2021, Motions due by 4/14/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/2/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 8/3/2021, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/13/2020. (asni, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Defendants Kelly Hawkins' and Rolf M. Baghdady,P.A.'s ANSWER to Complaint of Jeffrey Lett, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Rolf M Baghdady, Kelley B Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits referenced in Answer and Counterclaim)(Baghdady, Rolf)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jeffrey Lett. Response to Motion due by 10/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Motion to Remand)No proposed order.(Lybrand, Erica)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rolf M Baghdady re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories (Baghdady, Rolf)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Rolf M Baghdady.(asni, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County, case number 2020-CP-46-02253. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9330265), filed by Rolf M Baghdady. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Affidavit Rolf M. Baghdady P.A.)(asni, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/10/2020) (asni, ). Modified to replace document with legible copy on 9/10/2020 (asni, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lett v. Hawkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lett
Represented By: Erica Greer Lybrand
Represented By: Andrew Sims Radeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A Lett
Represented By: Erica Greer Lybrand
Represented By: Andrew Sims Radeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelley B Hawkins
Represented By: Rolf M Baghdady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolf M Baghdady
Represented By: Rolf M Baghdady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Trust Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelley M Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly M Hawkins
Represented By: Rolf M Baghdady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?