Ashford v. Myers et al
Plaintiff: Randolph Ashford
Defendant: Vivian Elliot, Halford Myers, Yvonne Munro, John Doe and Brazzel Nurse
Case Number: 0:2020cv03384
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #10 Proper Form Order, 14 Order, one (1) blank summons, and four (4) blank USM-285 forms placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Randolph Ashford 256638 Lee Corr. Inst. F-5 Rm #250 990 Wisacky HWY Bishopville, SC 29010. (mmcd) Modified on 11/4/2020 to edit docket text (mmcd).
November 3, 2020 Filing 14 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. In light of Plaintiff's notification of his change of address (ECF No. 13), the Clerk of Court is directed to re-mail the court's Proper Form Order issued October 14, 2020 (ECF No. 10) to Plaintiff at his new address of record. Plaintiff shall comply with the instructions in that order on or before November 24, 2020. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 11/3/2020. (kkus, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Randolph Ashford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mmcd)
October 29, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. "Return to Sender. No Such Street. Unable to forward." Addressee: Randolph Ashford. Document Returned: #10 Proper Form Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mmcd)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #10 Proper Form Order, one (1) blank summons, and four (4) blank USM-285 forms placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Randolph Ashford 256638 Broad River Correctional Institution 4460 Broad River Rd. Columbia, SC 29210. (mmcd)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 11/4/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Motion granted #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Motion denied: #4 motion to appoint counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 10/14/2020. (mmcd)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (mmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashford v. Myers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Elliot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halford Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brazzel Nurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Ashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?