Martin v. United States of America, The et al
Plaintiff: Erin Kristin Martin
Defendant: Kyle Elisabeth Baxter and United States of America, The
Case Number: 0:2020cv04062
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Response to Motion due by 2/9/2021) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/8/2021.(cbru, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Erin Kristin Martin. Response to Motion due by 1/22/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Koutrakos, Demetri)
January 4, 2021 Filing 14 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/4/2021. (cbru, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 13 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 2/8/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/5/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/5/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/4/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/4/2021, Discovery due by 7/6/2021, Motion in Limine due by 10/14/2021, Motions due by 7/19/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/1/2021, Bench Trial Deadline 11/4/2021, Mediation Due by 9/16/2021. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/4/2021. (cbru, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America, The. Response to Motion due by 1/12/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Conits, George)
December 7, 2020 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Erin Kristin Martin.(Koutrakos, Demetri)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY by United States of America, The to Judge Lewis's Standing Order. (Conits, George) Modified to edit text on 11/24/2020 (cbru, ).
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (United States of America, The answer due 12/29/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/23/2020.(cbru, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The parties' attention is directed to the Court's Standing Order Regarding All Removed Cases Assigned to Judge Mary Geiger Lewis, located on the District Court's website at https://www.scd.uscourts.gov/Forms/Special_Instructions/Lewis_Standing%20_Order_Regarding_Removed_Cases.pdf. Not later than seven days from the entry of this Text Order, Defendant(s) shall file the information mandated by the Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Reply due by 11/30/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/23/2020. (cbru, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant The United States of America is reminded that Local Rule 26.01 includes Interrogatories F and G which are directed to defendants only. Please file answers to these interrogatories no later than December 7, 2020. (cbru, )
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States of America, The. Response to Motion due by 12/4/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(cbru, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/23/2020) (cbru, ).
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America, The.(cbru, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/23/2020) (cbru, ).
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-46-03115 (Filing fee waived) filed by United States of America, The. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(cbru, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/23/2020) (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. United States of America, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Kristin Martin
Represented By: Demetri K Koutrakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Elisabeth Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, The
Represented By: George John Conits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?