Gaston v. McGill et al
Plaintiff: Adreal Neco Gaston
Defendant: Charles Eugene McGill, Jr., John/Jane Doe 1, John/Jane Doe 5, John/Jane Doe 4, P&S Transportation, LLC, John/Jane Doe 3, John/Jane Doe 2 and DT Freight, LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv01393
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Adreal Neco Gaston.(Corrigan, Kevin)
June 11, 2021 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/28/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/22/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/22/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/13/2021, Discovery due by 1/10/2022, Motion in Limine due by 3/11/2022, Motions due by 1/24/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/21/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 4/11/2022, Mediation Due by 2/7/2022, Signed by the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on June 11, 2021. (ahil)
June 10, 2021 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by DT Freight, LLC, Charles Eugene McGill, Jr, P&S Transportation, LLC.(Chase, Gerald)
June 10, 2021 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by DT Freight, LLC, Charles Eugene McGill, Jr, P&S Transportation, LLC, and Adreal Neco Gaston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Chase, Gerald)
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to DT Freight, LLC. (ahil)
May 28, 2021 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Adreal Neco Gaston.(Corrigan, Kevin)
May 28, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Adreal Neco Gaston. Service due by 8/26/2021 (Corrigan, Kevin) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/28/2021 to remove the Summons from the main document) (ahil).
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/3/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 6/17/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/28/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/23/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/21/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/12/2021, Discovery due by 11/10/2021, Motion in Limine due by 1/10/2022, Motions due by 11/24/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/18/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 2/8/2022, Mediation Due by 12/8/2021, Signed by the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on May 14, 2021. (ahil)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Charles Corrigan on behalf of Adreal Neco Gaston (Corrigan, Kevin)
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Charles Eugene McGill, Jr, P&S Transportation, LLC.(Chase, Gerald)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Daniel Moseley, Jr on behalf of Charles Eugene McGill, Jr, P&S Transportation, LLC (Moseley, Robert)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for York County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Acknowledgement by State Clerk)(Chase, Gerald)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charles Eugene McGill, Jr, P&S Transportation, LLC.(ahil)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-46-1142. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9833305), filed by Charles Eugene McGill, Jr, and P&S Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents York County Court of Common Pleas, 2021-cv-46-1142)(ahil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaston v. McGill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Eugene McGill, Jr.
Represented By: William Shafter Jackson, IV
Represented By: Gerald Thomas Chase
Represented By: Robert Daniel Moseley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P&S Transportation, LLC
Represented By: William Shafter Jackson, IV
Represented By: Gerald Thomas Chase
Represented By: Robert Daniel Moseley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DT Freight, LLC
Represented By: Gerald Thomas Chase
Represented By: Robert Daniel Moseley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adreal Neco Gaston
Represented By: David A Manzi
Represented By: Kevin Charles Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?