Faulkner et al v. York County School District et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Faulkner and John Faulkner
Defendant: York County School District and Michael Abraham
Case Number: 0:2021cv02090
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Michael Abraham, York County School District. (Williams, Lonnesse)
August 19, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss ; Replies due by 9/8/2021. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on August 19, 2021.(kbos)
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Michael Abraham, York County School District. Response to Motion due by 9/2/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Williams, Lonnesse)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Crystal Faulkner, John Faulkner.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/25/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Slavin, Joshua)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Response to Motion due by 8/18/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/2/2021.(asni, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Crystal Faulkner, John Faulkner. Response to Motion due by 8/16/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Slavin, Joshua)
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Crystal Faulkner, John Faulkner.(Slavin, Joshua)
July 21, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Abraham, York County School District. Response to Motion due by 8/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Support of MTD, #2 Supporting Documents ZW v. Horry County, #3 Supporting Documents Anderson v. Dorchester County, #4 Supporting Documents Arora v. James, #5 Supporting Documents Doe v. Berkeley, #6 Supporting Documents MTJH v. Spartanburg Co. 7, #7 Supporting Documents Clay v. Riley, #8 Supporting Documents Founders v. Hamilton, #9 Supporting Documents Liggett v. Fifth Third Mortg., #10 Supporting Documents Moore v. Ozmint, #11 Supporting Documents Richards v. Georgetown Cty, #12 Supporting Documents Tucker v. Shelton, #13 Supporting Documents Ferguson v. Pine Grove Sch)No proposed order.(Williams, Lonnesse)
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 Partial ANSWER to Complaint by Michael Abraham, York County School District.(Williams, Lonnesse)
July 14, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Abraham, York County School District.(asni, )
July 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County, case number 2020-CP-46-00300. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9957512), filed by York County School District, Michael Abraham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Documents Third Amended S&C, #2 Exhibit B Notice to Cir Court, #3 Exhibit C Notice to Plaintiff)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faulkner et al v. York County School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Faulkner
Represented By: Joshua Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Faulkner
Represented By: Joshua Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York County School District
Represented By: Ashley Cole Story
Represented By: Lonnesse Patrice Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Abraham
Represented By: Ashley Cole Story
Represented By: Lonnesse Patrice Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?