Spann-Mitchell v. Sheriff Kristin Graziano
Petitioner: Marquez Mitchell-Spann and Marquez Spann-Mitchell
Respondent: Sheriff Al Cannon, Sheriff Al Cannon Detention Center, Warden, Sheriff Al Cannon Detention Center and Sheriff Kristin Graziano
Case Number: 0:2021cv03153
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 21 Letter from Marquez Spann-Mitchell. (dist) (Main Document 21 replaced on 11/22/2021 with correct document and additional attachment added. #1 Envelope) (dist)
November 22, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #12 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, served on South Carolina Attorney Generals Office on 11/18/2021. (dist) Modified on 11/23/2021 to correct docket text. (dist)
November 18, 2021 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 13 Clerks Notice placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Marquez Spann-Mitchell, 0001480473, Sheriff Al Cannon Detention Center, 3841 Leeds Ave, North Charleston, SC 29405. (dist)
November 17, 2021 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, #14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Marquez Spann-Mitchell, 0001480473, Sheriff Al Cannon Detention Center, 3841 Leeds Ave, North Charleston, SC 29405. (dist)
November 16, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Marquez Spann-Mitchell. (dist) (Main Document 17 replaced on 11/19/2021 with corrected image and additional attachment added: #(1) Envelope) (dist).
November 16, 2021 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, 13 Clerks Notice, #14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Marquez Mitchell-Spann, 0001480473, Al Cannon Detention Center, 3841 Leeds Ave, North Charleston, SC 29405. #1 Petition and #12 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer sent via certified mail (receipt no. 7017-1450-0001-4670-1752) to Warden, Al Cannon Detention Center, 3841 Leeds Ave, North Charleston, SC 29405 and sent via certified mail (receipt no. 7017-1450-0001-4670-1936) to South Carolina Attorney Generals Office, PO Box 11549, Columbia, SC 29211. (dist)
November 15, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Suppress Evidence by Marquez Spann-Mitchell. Response to Motion due by 11/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (dist)
November 15, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the instant Petition for writ of habeas corpus be dismissed without prejudice and without requiring the Respondent to file a return. Objections to R&R due by 11/29/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 11/12/2021. (dist) Modified on 11/17/2021 to correct signature date. (dist)
November 15, 2021 Filing 13 Clerks Notice: #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis addressed in #12 Order. (dist) Modified on 11/16/2021 to correct docket text. (dist) Modified on 11/17/2021 to correct filing date. (dist)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Motion Granted: #8 petitioners request to proceed in forma paueris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 11/12/2021. (dist) Modified on 11/16/2021 to correct filing date. (dist). Modified on 11/17/2021 to correct signature date. (dist)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Marquez Spann-Mitchell. Response to Motion due by 11/12/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.(Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett.(bgoo) Modified on 11/16/2021 to correct spelling of petitioner's name (dist).
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #4 Proper Form Order and IFP Application placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Marquez Spann-Mitchell, 0001480473, Sheriff Al Cannon Dentention Center, 3841 Leeds Ave., North Charleston, SC 29405.(lbak) Modified on 11/16/2021 to correct spelling of petitioner's name (dist).
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 11/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 10/13/2021. (lbak)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Charleston. (mmcd)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Marquez Mitchell-Spann. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spann-Mitchell v. Sheriff Kristin Graziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marquez Mitchell-Spann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marquez Spann-Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Al Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Al Cannon Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Sheriff Al Cannon Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Kristin Graziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?