WILSON v. BROAD RIVER CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION et al
Plaintiff: PIERE ROMEO DAVON WILSON
Defendant: Broad River Correctional Institution, Mrs. Williams, Sgt Daniels and Dr Bryant
Case Number: 0:2021cv03670
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 21 Letter from PIERE ROMEO DAVON WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (dist)
January 3, 2022 Filing 20 Letter from PIERE ROMEO DAVON WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Envelope) (dist)
December 28, 2021 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 17 TEXT Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to PIERE ROMEO DAVON WILSON, 368983, LIEBER CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, P.O. BOX 205, Ridgeville, SC 29472. (dist)
December 28, 2021 Filing 17 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #16 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until January 26, 2022 to submit the remainder of the filing fee. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/28/2021. (jwhi, )
December 27, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time by PIERE ROMEO DAVON WILSON. Response to Motion due by 1/10/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (dist)
December 9, 2021 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: 12 Clerk's Notice, #11 Proper Form Order, one blank IFP form, one blank summons and four blank USM 285 forms placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to PIERE ROMEO DAVON WILSON, 368983, LIEBER CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, P.O. BOX 205, Ridgeville, SC 29472. (dist)
December 8, 2021 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice: #4 Motion for Discovery addressed in #11 Proper Form Order. (dist) Modified on 12/8/2021 to correct docket text. (dist)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 12/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/8/2021. (dist)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by PIERE ROMEO DAVON WILSON. (dist)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-02350. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the District of South Carolina. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 11/9/2021. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 10/20/2021. (lcsw) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/9/2021.]
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Discovery by PIERE ROMEO DAVON WILSON. (znmw) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/9/2021.]
October 1, 2021 Case directly reassigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. Judge Randolph D. Moss is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/9/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/22/2021. (lcrdm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/9/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: To ensure compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve Defendants with a summons and a copy of the complaint on or before November 28, 2021. If Plaintiff fails to serve Defendants and to file proof of service with the Court by November 28, 2021, and if he does not show good cause for an extension of time to effect service on or before November 28, 2021, the Court will dismiss the action without prejudice. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/22/2021. (lcrdm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/9/2021.]
September 14, 2021 SUMMONS Not Issued as to BROAD RIVER CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, BRYANT, DANIELS, WILLIAMS (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/9/2021.]
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BROAD RIVER CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, BRYANT, DANIELS, WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 200507) filed by PIERE ROMEO DAVON WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/9/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. BROAD RIVER CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PIERE ROMEO DAVON WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broad River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?