Brown v. Warden, Evans Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Taquan L. Brown and Tequan L. Brown
Respondent: Bryan P. Stirling and Warden, Evans Correctional Institution
Case Number: 0:2022cv00159
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
2 Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #14 Order, 15 Clerk's Notice placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Taquan L. Brown, 341915, Evans Correctional Institution, 610 Hwy 9 West, Bennettsville, SC 29512. (dist) Modified to create linkage on 3/17/2022 (dist, ).
March 16, 2022 Filing 15 Clerk's Notice #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis addressed in #14 . (dist)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Petitioner twenty-one (21) days from the date this order is entered to either (1) show cause why the Petition should be stayed pursuant to Rhines v. Weber, 544 U.S. 269 (2005), or (2) file an amended petition that includes only unexhausted claims. (Specific Document due by 4/6/2022.) Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 3/15/2022. (dist)
February 28, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Taquan L. Brown. Response to Motion due by 3/14/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (dist)
February 14, 2022 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #8 Proper Form Order and IFP Application placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Taquan L. Brown, 34191,5 Evans Correctional Institution, 610 Hwy 9 West, Bennettsville, SC 29512. (lbak)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 3/7/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.); Warden, Evans Correctional Institution added. Bryan P. Stirling terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 2/14/2022. (lbak)
January 27, 2022 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 5 Case Reassigned placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Taquan L. Brown, #341915, Evans Correctional Institution, 610 Hwy 9 West, Bennettsville, SC 29512 (bshr, )
January 27, 2022 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Honorable Timothy M Cain. Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis no longer assigned to the case. (bshr, )
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Charleston. (dist)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Taquan L. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (dist)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Warden, Evans Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Taquan L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tequan L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan P. Stirling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Evans Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?