Wiskerchen v. Mumpower et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Wiskerchen
Defendant: Stephen Mumpower, Caleb Parker, Dunae Nesmith, Chad Burgess, LaTonya Burgess, Dream Carolina Watersports, Dream Carolina Realty, Dream Carolina Realty Group, LLC, Dream Carolina Community Care, LLC and Dream Carolina Investments, LLC
Case Number: 0:2022cv02361
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter McBrayer Wood on behalf of Danielle Wiskerchen (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service - Wood Notice of Appearance)(Wood, Walter)
September 2, 2022 Filing 18 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting with consent and for good cause shown #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 9/2/2022. (kkus, )
August 30, 2022 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #16 Order to Notify of Address Change placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Stephen Mumpower, 2718 Skyland Drive, Gastonia, NC 28042. (dist)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 8/30/2022. (dist)
August 30, 2022 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time by Danielle Wiskerchen. Response to Motion due by 9/13/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Clawson, Samuel)
August 25, 2022 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 10 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge(Non-Consent), 11 Transfer of Case Management placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Stephen Mumpower, 2718 Skyland Drive, Gastonia, NC 28042 (cbru, )
August 25, 2022 Filing 11 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 901 Richland Street, Columbia, SC 29201. (cbru, )
August 25, 2022 Filing 10 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett pursuant to LR 73.02. Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(cbru, )
August 25, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to Transfer Venue by Stephen Mumpower. Response to Motion due by 9/8/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.(cbru, )
August 25, 2022 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stephen Mumpower. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(cbru, )
August 25, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Stephen Mumpower. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(cbru, )
August 23, 2022 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. (Caleb Parker answer due 9/23/2022) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/23/2022.(cbru, )
August 22, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Caleb Parker. Response to Motion due by 9/6/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Correll, Boyd) Modified to correct motion relief on 8/23/2022 (cbru, ). (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/23/2022) (cbru, ).
July 25, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chad Burgess, LaTonya Burgess, Dream Carolina Community Care, LLC, Dream Carolina Realty, Dream Carolina Realty Group, LLC, Dream Carolina Watersports, Stephen Mumpower, Dunae Nesmith, Caleb Parker. (cbru, )
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Danielle Wiskerchen.(cbru, )
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chad Burgess, LaTonya Burgess, Dream Carolina Community Care, LLC, Dream Carolina Investments, LLC, Dream Carolina Realty, Dream Carolina Realty Group, LLC, Dream Carolina Watersports, Stephen Mumpower, Dunae Nesmith, Caleb Parker (Filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-10605444) filed by Danielle Wiskerchen. Service due by 10/20/2022(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiskerchen v. Mumpower et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Wiskerchen
Represented By: Bert Glenn Utsey, III
Represented By: Christina Rae Fargnoli
Represented By: Samuel Richard Clawson, Jr
Represented By: Walter McBrayer Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Mumpower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb Parker
Represented By: Boyd Alexander Correll, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunae Nesmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaTonya Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dream Carolina Watersports
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dream Carolina Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dream Carolina Realty Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dream Carolina Community Care, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dream Carolina Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?