South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. v. SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC et al
Plaintiff: South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Defendant: SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Richard J. Sabella and Philip Kassover
Case Number: 0:2024cv00524
Filed: January 31, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Neil E. Youngdahl ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11680305) by ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC, Richard J. Sabella. Response to Motion due by 4/12/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application and Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Gowdown, Andrew)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Perrin Rynders ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11680297) by ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC, Richard J. Sabella. Response to Motion due by 4/12/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application and Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Gowdown, Andrew)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/16/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/30/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 4/30/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/21/2024, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 6/20/2024, Defendants' ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/22/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/22/2024, Discovery due by 9/20/2024, Motions due by 11/19/2024, Bench Trial Deadline 1/21/2025, Mediation Due by 10/21/2024, and Rule 56 Conference Deadline 10/29/2024, Signed by the Honorable Jacquelyn D. Austin on March 26, 2024. (ahil)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Philip Kassover. (ahil)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC, Richard J. Sabella.(Blanchard, Daniel)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT PHILIP KASSOVER bySouth Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Default by Walter H. Cartin)(Cartin, Walter) (Main Document 40 and Attachment 1 replaced on 3/26/2024 with document provided by filer.) (ahil)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER granting #35 Motion for Jenna Rae Bird to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants SCP 2001 A-CSF-72, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company, LLC, ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC and Richard Sabella. Signed by the Honorable Jacquelyn D. Austin on March 20, 2024.(ahil)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER granting #34 Motion for Mark Mikhaiel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants SCP 2001 A-CSF-72, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company, LLC, ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC and Richard Sabella. Signed by the Honorable Jacquelyn D. Austin on March 20, 2024.(ahil)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER granting #33 Motion for Aanchal Sharma to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants SCP 2001 A-CSF-72, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company, LLC, ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC and Richard Sabella. Signed by the Honorable Jacquelyn D. Austin on March 20, 2024.(ahil)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ORDER granting #27 First motion for extension of time to file an answer by Defendants GCC Realty Company, LLC, as successor-by-merger for GCC Lancaster, LLC; ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, as successor-by-merger for SCP 2001 A-CSF-72, LLC; Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC; and Richard Sabella (Defendants). The Defendants shall have an extension until May 3, 2024, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Honorable Jacquelyn D Austin on 3/20/24.(jtho, )
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jenna Rae Bird ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11659176) by ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC, Richard J. Sabella. Response to Motion due by 4/2/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application and Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Gowdown, Andrew)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Mikhaiel ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11659169) by ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC, Richard J. Sabella. Response to Motion due by 4/2/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application and Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Gowdown, Andrew)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aanchal Sharma ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11659165) by ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC, Richard J. Sabella. Response to Motion due by 4/2/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application and Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Gowdown, Andrew)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 FOR SCP 2001A-CSF-72, LLC, by ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC, Richard J. Sabella.(Gowdown, Andrew) Modified on 3/20/2024 to edit text (ahil).
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 FOR GCC Realty Company,LLC by ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC, Richard J. Sabella.(Gowdown, Andrew) Modified on 3/20/2024 to edit text (ahil).
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 FOR GCC Lancaster, LLC by ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC, Richard J. Sabella.(Gowdown, Andrew) Modified on 3/20/2024 to edit text (ahil).
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 FOR Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC by ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC, Richard J. Sabella.(Gowdown, Andrew) Modified on 3/20/2024 to edit text (ahil).
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 FOR ACLCP Lancaster, LLC by ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC, Richard J. Sabella.(Gowdown, Andrew) Modified on 3/20/2024 to edit text (ahil).
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC, Richard J. Sabella. Response to Motion due by 4/2/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Gowdown, Andrew)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC, Richard J. Sabella.(Gowdown, Andrew)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel F Blanchard, III on behalf of ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC, Richard J. Sabella (Blanchard, Daniel)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D Gowdown on behalf of ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC, Richard J. Sabella (Gowdown, Andrew)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBERS 13-19 Reason: Refiled by filer to correct filing issues. Corrected Filing Document Number #21 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: 2/26/2024 (ahil)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: Matthew J. Perry, Jr. U.S. Courthouse, 901 Richland Street, Columbia, SC 29201. (ahil)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents - Summons Served on SCP 2001-CSF-75, LLC, #2 Supporting Documents - Summons Served on GCC Lancaster, LLC, #3 Supporting Documents - Summons Served on GCC Realty Company, LLC, #4 Supporting Documents - Summons Served on Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, #5 Supporting Documents - Summons Served on ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, #6 Supporting Documents - Summons Served on Richard Sabella, #7 Supporting Documents - Summons Served on Philip Kassover)(Cartin, Walter) Modified on 2/28/2024 to change filing date to that of the original filings. (ahil).
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Jacquelyn D Austin. Judge Honorable Sherri A Lydon no longer assigned to the case. (dist, )
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Deposit Interpleader Funds (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Cartin, Walter)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC. (ahil, )
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Richard J. Sabella. (ahil)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Philip Kassover. (ahil, )
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to GCC Realty Company LLC. (ahil)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to GCC Lancaster, LLC. (ahil)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC. (ahil)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ACLCP Lancaster, LLC. (ahil)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.(ahil)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACLCP Lancaster, LLC, Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC, GCC Lancaster, LLC, GCC Realty Company LLC, Philip Kassover, Richard J. Sabella, SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11563052.), filed by South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. Service due by 4/30/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lease, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lease Renewal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Lease Renewal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of SCP Assignment, #5 Exhibit 5 - Kassover Attorney-in-Fact of GCC Realty, #6 Exhibit 6 - CVS's Request for Joint Payment Instructions, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - ACLCP Interest Claim)(ahil, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. v. SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jeffrey Evan Phillips
Represented By: Walter Hammond Cartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCP 2001A-CSF-72 LLC
Represented By: Aanchal Sharma
Represented By: Andrew D Gowdown
Represented By: Daniel F Blanchard, III
Represented By: Jenna Rae Bird
Represented By: Mark Mikhaiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCC Lancaster, LLC
Represented By: Aanchal Sharma
Represented By: Andrew D Gowdown
Represented By: Daniel F Blanchard, III
Represented By: Jenna Rae Bird
Represented By: Mark Mikhaiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCC Realty Company LLC
Represented By: Aanchal Sharma
Represented By: Andrew D Gowdown
Represented By: Daniel F Blanchard, III
Represented By: Jenna Rae Bird
Represented By: Mark Mikhaiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allerand Realty Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Aanchal Sharma
Represented By: Andrew D Gowdown
Represented By: Daniel F Blanchard, III
Represented By: Jenna Rae Bird
Represented By: Mark Mikhaiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACLCP Lancaster, LLC
Represented By: Aanchal Sharma
Represented By: Andrew D Gowdown
Represented By: Daniel F Blanchard, III
Represented By: Jenna Rae Bird
Represented By: Mark Mikhaiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Sabella
Represented By: Aanchal Sharma
Represented By: Andrew D Gowdown
Represented By: Daniel F Blanchard, III
Represented By: Jenna Rae Bird
Represented By: Mark Mikhaiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Kassover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?