James v. Ozmint
Petitioner: Isiah James, Jr
Respondent: Warden Ridgeland Correctional Institution
Case Number: 1:2008cv02256
Filed: June 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Sumter
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER denying Petitioner's 130 MOTION to Alter Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 7/17/2017. (mwal)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying 119 MOTION for Relief from Judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b)(5) and denying 120 MOTION for Recusal filed by Isiah James, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 11/17/2016. (mwal)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying 99 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 3/13/2013.(abuc)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying 72 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 10/12/2010.(mcot, )
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's Report is ACCEPTED, petitioner's objections 67 are OVERRULED; respondent's motion for summary judgment 41 is GRANTED, petitioner's motion for summary judgment 51 is DENIED, and this case is DISMISSED. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 9/13/2010. (mcot, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Ozmint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Isiah James, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Ridgeland Correctional Institution
Represented By: Tommy Evans, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?