Beard et al v. Adiz LLC et al
Plaintiff: Derith P Beard, Sara W Barrineau and Amela Porca-Malkic
Defendant: Adiz LLC, ATC Development Corp and ATC Construction LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv02202
Filed: August 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Aiken
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS adopting 127 Report and Recommendations, dismissing Third-Party Defendant Robert Renew d/b/a Renew Siding without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 8/31/2011. (jpet, ) (Main Document 139 replaced on 9/1/2011) (asni, ). Modified to replace order at the request of chambers to remove language referring case to magistrate on 9/1/2011 (asni, ).
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that Third-Party Defendant Custom Air, Inc is given thirty (30) days to retain counsel and to file its Answer or otherwise respond to the Third-Party Complaint. If Third-Party Defendant Custom Air, Inc fails to retain licensed counsel to file an entry of appearance and submit a responsive pleading, then the Answer which was filed pro se will be stricken by the court, re 45 Answer to Third Party Complaint filed by Custom Air Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 12/9/2010. (jpet, )
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER giving Third-Party Defendant Duck & Son, Inc thirty (30) days from the date of this order to retain counsel and file its Answer or otherwise plead or the Answer filed by the pro se party on behalf of Duck & Son, Inc will be stricken by the court, re 29 Answer to Third Party Complaint filed by Duck & Son Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 11/22/2010. (jpet, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beard et al v. Adiz LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derith P Beard
Represented By: Steven Douglas Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara W Barrineau
Represented By: Steven Douglas Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amela Porca-Malkic
Represented By: Steven Douglas Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adiz LLC
Represented By: Steven Wayne Ouzts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATC Development Corp
Represented By: Steven Wayne Ouzts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATC Construction LLC
Represented By: Steven Wayne Ouzts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?