Graham-Willis v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Brook Graham-Willis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2012cv02489
Filed: August 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Abbeville
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER AND OPINION granting 23 Motion for Attorney Fees per Rule 406b, awarding $20,075.00 in fees. Signed by Honorable J. Michelle Childs on 07/01/2015.(bshr, )
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Attorney Fees, awarding $4,372.78 in attorney'sfees under the EAJA and $350.00 for the filing fee. Signed by Honorable J. Michelle Childs on 02/25/2014.(bshr, )
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 13 Report and Recommendation, reversing the decision of the Commissioner remanding the action for further proceedings consistent with the magistrate judges recommendation under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Honorable J. Michelle Childs on 12/27/2013. (bshr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham-Willis v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brook Graham-Willis
Represented By: Paul Townsend McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?