Godfrey v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Timothy Godfrey
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2015cv02036
Filed: May 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Spartanburg
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Attorney Fees per Rule 406b, awarding fees in the amount of $20,314.00. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 05/01/2017.(bshr, )
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Attorney Fees, awarding Plaintiff $2,591.57 in attorneys fees pursuant to the EAJA. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 04/27/2016.(bshr, )
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 18 Report and Recommendation, reversing the decision of the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and remanding the matter for further administrative action. Signed by the Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 01/28/2016. (bshr, )
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint - Social Security, recommending the decision of the Commissioner be reversed pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and the matter be remanded for further administrative proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 2/12/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 01/26/2016. (bshr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godfrey v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Godfrey
Represented By: Paul Townsend McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?