Tolen v. Cartledge
Petitioner: Frank Tolen, Jr
Respondent: Larry Cartledge
Case Number: 1:2015cv02503
Filed: June 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER adopting and incorporating 41 Report and Recommendation; granting Respondent's 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; and dismissing petition with prejudice. A certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 9/26/2017. (mwal)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER adopting 41 Report and Recommendation; granting Respondent's 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; and dismissing Petitioner's petition with prejudice. A certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 9/13/2016. (mwal)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER directing Petitioner to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Respondent's 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment by May 31, 2016. Petitioner is further advised that no further extensions will be granted and if he fails to respond, this action will be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 5/17/2016. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolen v. Cartledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frank Tolen, Jr
Represented By: Jeremy Adam Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Cartledge
Represented By: James Anthony Mabry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?