Law et al v. Fairfax, The Town of et al

Plaintiff: Charles Law, Sr and Betty J Law
Defendant: Fairfax, The Town of, John Doe and J Singleton
Case Number: 1:2015cv03309
Filed: August 19, 2015
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Aiken Office
County: Allendale
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Clerk to forward the file to the United States District Judge for trial. Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 9/18/2017. (mwal)
August 7, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Second MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Michael R Culler and Glenn Walters terminated for Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 8/7/2017. (mwal)
July 5, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Suggestion of Death There is no indication on the record that the Suggestion of Death has been served on any other successors or other representatives of Mrs. Law pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.2 Therefore, Plaintiff&# 039;s counsel is instructed to serve a copy of its Suggestion of Death [ECF No. 36] and this order, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, on any known nonparty successor or representative of Mrs. Law and to file proof of said service by July 19, 2017. If no party files a motion for substitution within 90 days from the service of the personal representative, Mrs. Law's action will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 7/5/2017. (mwal)
February 5, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 14 Report and Recommendation. Defendants' 4 Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/5/2016. (mwal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Law et al v. Fairfax, The Town of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Law, Sr
Represented By: Michael R Culler
Represented By: Glenn Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty J Law
Represented By: Michael R Culler
Represented By: Glenn Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfax, The Town of
Represented By: Christy L Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Christy L Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Singleton
Represented By: Christy L Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?