Johnson v. Sterling et al
Plaintiff: Carl Dante Johnson
Defendant: Bryan P Sterling and Harold Campbell
Case Number: 1:2015cv04942
Filed: December 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: McCormick
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER adopting the 45 Report and Recommendation as the order of the Court and dismissing the case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Honorable Richard M. Gergel on 12/19/2016. (bgoo)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER directing the Plaintiff to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to the Defendants' 37 motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment by October 11, 2016. Plaintiff is further advised that if he fails to respond, this action will be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/27/2016. (bgoo)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 23 MOTION for Joinder and class action status. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 5/12/2016. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Sterling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Dante Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan P Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?