United States of America v. Prosser

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Charles M Prosser
Case Number: 1:2016cv00866
Filed: March 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Aiken
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER AND OPINION RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 35 Report and Recommendation denying a moot 27 Motion for Sanctions, granting Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/8/2017. (asni, )
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER defendant is directed to advise the court whether he opposes the Government's 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to file a response to the motion by May 18, 2017. Defendant is further advised that if he fails to respond, the undersigned will recommend judgment be entered against him based on his failure to defend. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 5/4/2017. (mwal)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 20 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by United States of America. Defendant is directed to provide responded to the discovery requests by January 10, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 12/27/2016. (mwal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Prosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John Douglas Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles M Prosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?