Chandler v. McFadden
Defendant: Joseph McFadden
Petitioner: Terrell Chandler
Case Number: 1:2016cv02994
Filed: September 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Dorchester
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED OPINION & ORDER withdrawing the court's May 15, 2017 order 23 , vacating the May 15, 2017 judgment 24 , adopting the Report and Recommendation 20 , granting the Respondent's motion for summary judgment 8 , dismissing the action with prejudice, and denying a certificate of appealability. Signed by Honorable Henry M. Herlong, Jr. on 6/6/2017. (bgoo)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION & ORDER vacating the court's May 15, 2017 order 23 , adopting the Report and Recommendation 20 , granting the Respondent's motion for summary judgment 8 , dismissing the action with prejudice, and denying a certificate of appealability. Signed by Honorable Henry M. Herlong, Jr. on 6/5/2017. (bgoo)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER & OPINION adopting 20 Report and Recommendation; granting Respondent's 8 Motion for Summary Judgment; and dismissing Petition with prejudice. A certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 5/15/2017. (mwal)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER warning Petitioner that filings containing contaminants of any kind are not accepted by this court and are expressly prohibited. Petitioner is advised that his filing will not be docketed in this case or otherwise presented for the court's consideration. Petitioner's deadline to file a response to 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment is now December 19, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 11/18/2016. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler v. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrell Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph McFadden
Represented By: Donald John Zelenka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?