York v. Starks et al
Plaintiff: Herbert Demond York
Defendant: T. Starks, Ofc. Lovine, Mojor Jackson and Corper. Extratel
Case Number: 1:2016cv03972
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Kershaw
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER adopting the 91 Report and Recommendation, granting the 68 Motion for Summary Judgment, and finding as moot the 67 Motion to Compel for Sanctions. Signed by Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. on 8/21/2018. (bgoo)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. (mwal)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL directing that Daniel R. Settana, Jr. of The McKay Firm, P.A. be substituted as counsel for Charles A. Kinney as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Honorable Richard M. Gergel on 11/6/2017. (bgoo)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 57 MOTION to Compel as moot; granting Defendants' 60 MOTION to Compel; and granting Defendants' 61 MOTION for Extension of time to file dispositive motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 7/14/2017. (mwal)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting Defendant's 45 MOTION to Take Deposition from Herbert Demond York, on Monday, May 22, 2017, at 1:00 p.m. at Broad River Correctional Institution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 5/17/2017. (mwal)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 18 MOTION to Add Party and 26 MOTION to Substitute Party to the extent he seeks to have the defendant correctly identified as Juan Estrada on the docket. Plaintiff's 39 MOTION to Appoint Counsel is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 4/10/2017. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: York v. Starks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Demond York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Lovine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mojor Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corper. Extratel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?