James v. Compton et al
Plaintiff: Demetrice James
Defendant: Dr. Compton, Officer Oneil, Officer Herell and Sgt. Matthews
Case Number: 1:2017cv00030
Filed: January 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice as to Defendants Dr. Compton; Officer Oneil; Sgt. Matthews; and dismissing case without prejudice as to Defendant Officer Herell. (mwal)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER directing Plaintiff to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Defendants' 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment by 10/6/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 9/22/2017. (mwal)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER adopting and incorporating 44 Report and Recommendation; granting Defendant Herell's 25 MOTION to Dismiss; and dismissing Officer Herell from this action without prejudice. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 8/23/2017. (mwal)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER directing Plaintiff to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Herell's 25 MOTION to Dismiss by July 11, 2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 7/27/2017. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Compton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrice James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Oneil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Herell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?