Johnson v. Cannon et al

Petitioner: Tristan Johnson
Respondent: Al Cannon, Chieff Beatty, Nicholas G. Smit and Scarlet Wilson
Case Number: 1:2017cv02500
Filed: September 19, 2017
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Aiken Office
County: Abbeville
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice. (mwal)
November 7, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 13 Report and Recommendation and dismissing Petition without prejudice and without requiring Respondents to file an answer. A certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/7/2017. (mwal)
October 17, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising petitioner to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Motions granted: 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 10/17/2017. (mwal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Cannon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tristan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Al Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chieff Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nicholas G. Smit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scarlet Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?